U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00512
  • Case Name: Fisk et al v. Intel Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule]
  • May 12, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • May 08, 2025: [Attorney Association]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Declination of Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Implied Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge - FORM EVENT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.