U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00510
  • Case Name: Mendoza et al v. American Stategic Insurance Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 08, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.