U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00491
  • Case Name: Morgan v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service - 2254 State Habeas]
  • April 29, 2025: [5 - Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order 2254 & 2241]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 07, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Petition - Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.