U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00501
  • Case Name: White v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Sur-Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Recuse]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
  • April 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party - FORM EVENT]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party]
  • March 26, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.