U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00514
  • Case Name: Empower Clinic Services, L.L.C. v. LegitScript LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Strike]
  • May 09, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • May 05, 2025: [Supplemental Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
  • April 14, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 26, 2025: [File Document Under Seal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.