U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-02161
  • Case Name: Davis v. LifePoint Health, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [0seal - Seal Docket Entry and/or Document ONLY use with other selection]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [0seal - Seal Docket Entry and/or Document ONLY use with other selection]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.