U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00293
  • Case Name: Miller v. Heimuller et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2025: [0seal - Seal Docket Entry and/or Document ONLY use with other selection]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 28, 2025: [File Document Under Seal]
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.