U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00174
  • Case Name: McCullagh v. SmartMatch Insurance Agency, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 27, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.