U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01891
  • Case Name: Dickinson v. Sorel
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Trial Management Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Hearing Held]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sur-Reply to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.