U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01739
  • Case Name: Librande v. Boumont et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel]
  • May 06, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [6 - Prisoner Civil Rights Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.