U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cv-01806
  • Case Name: Schroeder et al v. University of Oregon
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
  • April 18, 2025: [Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript of Proceedings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.