U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-00990
  • Case Name: CLF 007 et al v. CooperSurgical, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • May 09, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • May 09, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
  • May 08, 2025: [Complaint - Third Party]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismissal of Party]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.