U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01844
  • Case Name: DeRaedt v. La Clinica et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Returned Mail]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 01, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.