U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00536
  • Case Name: Hamann v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service - 2254 State Habeas]
  • April 29, 2025: [5 - Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order 2254 & 2241]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 01, 2025: [Petition - Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.