U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00324
  • Case Name: Kasadu v. Mid-Willamette Valley Community Action Agency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Stayed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [0exp - Ex Parte Docket Entry and/or Document USE ONLY with other selection.]
  • April 09, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amend Complaint/Petition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.