U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-02067
  • Case Name: Schroeder v. Amazon.com Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Findings & Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Objections to Findings & Recommendation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 16, 2025: [Objections to Findings & Recommendation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation Referred]
  • April 02, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.