U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00553
  • Case Name: Collins v. Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Dismissal (60-day) - Terminate Case]
  • May 01, 2025: [Settlement Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.