U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00547
  • Case Name: Crouse v. Housing Works et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
  • April 29, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party - FORM EVENT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party]
  • April 18, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Application for Leave to Proceed IFP]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.