U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00552
  • Case Name: Kruss v. Berkshire Life Insurance Company of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 06, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 04, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.