U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00331
  • Case Name: Quinn et al v. Legacy Health et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 03, 2025: [Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.