U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01988
  • Case Name: O'Brien v. ODOC Director of Health Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [6 - Prisoner Civil Rights Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 25, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 21, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 21, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.