U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00548
  • Case Name: Hammond v. Portland Police Bureau et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: [Amend Complaint/Petition]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Change/Transfer Venue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 10, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Application for Leave to Proceed IFP]
  • April 03, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.