U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00554
  • Case Name: Enfield et al v. United States et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 07, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.