U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00555
  • Case Name: Kraker v. Pacific Residential Mortgage, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate]
  • April 25, 2025: [Consolidate]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 07, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.