U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01474
  • Case Name: Wade v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summary Judgment or 12(b) Dismissal Advice Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.