U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00559
  • Case Name: Lane v. Medford Oregon city Attorney's Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [9CONV - Conventionally Filed Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summary Judgment or 12(b) Dismissal Advice Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 21, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
  • April 16, 2025: [9CONV - Conventionally Filed Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: [9CONV - Conventionally Filed Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 07, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.