U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00572
  • Case Name: Vimegnon v. Gallagher Bassett
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party - FORM EVENT]
  • May 02, 2025: [Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party - FORM EVENT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amend Complaint/Petition]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 09, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.