U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00566
  • Case Name: Bell v. State of Oregon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
  • May 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 06, 2025: [Objection]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 22, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Jury Demand]
  • April 22, 2025: [Application for Leave to Proceed IFP]
  • April 18, 2025: [Clerks Notice of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Declination of Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice to Filer of Noncompliance with Prisoner E-filing Program]
  • April 08, 2025: [Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 08, 2025: [Application for Leave to Proceed IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.