U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00564
  • Case Name: Bjyrd v. Walmart Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.