U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00578
  • Case Name: Manning v. Clackamas County Sheriff's Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • May 09, 2025: [Service Papers Received]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: [9CONV - Conventionally Filed Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Application for Leave to Proceed IFP]
  • April 09, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.