U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01898
  • Case Name: Oregon Natural Desert Ass'n v. Kendall et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Objections to Findings & Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File an Objection to F & R]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Objection to F & R]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Objection to F & R]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response to Objection to F & R]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.