U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00599
  • Case Name: Brodsky v. Roche et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • May 06, 2025: [Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Implied Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge - FORM EVENT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.