U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-31227-thp7
  • Case Name: Chad Wesley Thomas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [Amended Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [xBNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [Order and Notice Re: Time to File Documents]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Huffman, Jeanne E [Statement of Social Security Number (OF 121 - 12/15)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.