U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00621
  • Case Name: Ray et al v. Psychiatric Crisis Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 02, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 17, 2025: [Application for Leave to Proceed IFP]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.