U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-61060-tmr13
  • Case Name: Trey Kaleb Thurber
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Extend Time File Missing/Conversion Documents]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Extend Time File Missing/Conversion Documents]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Notice of Rescheduled or Adjourned Hearing on Confirmation]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Order and Notice Re: Time to File Documents]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Missing or Deficient Ch 13 Debtor's Attorney's Compensation Disclosure/Application (text-only)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Pay Filing Fees in Installment(s)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Statement of Social Security Number (OF 121 - 12/15)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Pay Filing Fee in Installments [Requires LBF 110 - 12/1/21 or OF B 103A]]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.