U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-61248-tmr13
  • Case Name: Sharon Lynne Boughton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Notice of Pre-Confirmation Ch 12/13 Amendment of Plan [Requires LBF 1355.05 - 2/28/25]]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [CHAP ME Confirmation Hearing Adjourned/Held]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Striking Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Markel, Naliko [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.