U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Molina-Orantes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript of Proceedings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Revoke]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [1- Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [5-Brady Disclosure Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 17, 2025: [1-First / Initial Criminal Master Minutes]
  • April 17, 2025: [9CONV - Set/Reset/Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.