U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00640
  • Case Name: Bradshaw et al v. Jewkes et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party - FORM EVENT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response]
  • April 24, 2025: [Settlement Agreement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party]
  • April 23, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party - FORM EVENT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 22, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.