U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00666
  • Case Name: Harper v. Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Implied Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge - FORM EVENT]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 05, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 05, 2025: [Remand]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer]
  • April 23, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.