open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:12-cv-01156
    Party Name:GANNAWAY v. PRIME CARE MEDICAL, INC. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Notice of Docketing ROA]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objections]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe/Request]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Default]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?459360
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =