open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:5:14-cv-04413
    Party Name:SHADE v. FIRSTENERGY CORPORATION
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Counterclaim]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?493958
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =