open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:20-cv-03953
    Party Name:Williams
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Attorney)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Remark]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Final Discipline Order]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?498043
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =