open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:03-cr-00157-1
    Party Name:USA v. SANTIAGO et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Suspend Sentence]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:July 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Defender Association]
    Date Published:June 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - PDF]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:March 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Probationer]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - RESTRICTED]
    Date Published:December 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:May 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:April 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Probation]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Writ]
    Date Published:February 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Detention]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:December 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Property/PostTrial]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Case]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Supplement]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplement]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Document]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Copy of TPO Form]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal (Public Entry - Judicial Document)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Depart]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Depart]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal Document]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Memorandum]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Abstract of Order for Presentence Investigation]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to admit]
    Date Published:May 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Admit]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request and Order to Modify Supervision]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Commitment to Another District]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arrest - Rule 40]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set Scheduling Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of US Passport]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bail]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter to Unseal]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Support]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Hearing]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reducing Sentence re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Findings of Fact]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Response]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Sealing and Impounding]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Document Filed]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:January 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:January 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:December 29, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce re: 782 Amendment]
    Date Published:December 22, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:December 22, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:December 11, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:November 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?468681
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =