open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cr-00222-2
    Party Name:USA v. PARSLEY et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of US Passport]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request and Order to Modify Supervision]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:May 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:December 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?490821
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =