open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-04010
    Party Name:KANG et al v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Returned Mail]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Petition]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Relief]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Relief]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sanctions]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?493201
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =