open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:13-cv-06445
    Party Name:WILES v. PHILADELPHIA PRISON SYSTEMS et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:October 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:October 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Depose]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Remove from Suspense]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?483898
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =