open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-05640
    Party Name:MASON v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:October 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Notice of Docketing ROA]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Notice to USCA]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe/Request]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?496419
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =