open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:08-cr-00016-1
    Party Name:USA v. REESE
  • Filing Type:Criminal [MAG Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document (Use only for documents already on file)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
    Date Published:July 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:July 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - RESTRICTED]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Warrant]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant ]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Petition for Warrant or Summons]
    Date Published:May 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Document]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Information]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Praecipe to Satisfy Judgment]
    Date Published:October 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Redacted Document]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Psychiatric Report]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:April 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - No PDF]
    Date Published:April 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
    Date Published:April 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Permit]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Permit]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set Scheduling Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Detention]
    Date Published:December 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment Unsealed]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter to Unseal]
    Date Published:December 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal Document]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment (Sealed)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Bond]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:August 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Modifying the Conditions of Supervision]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Hearing]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order of Probation]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Seal (Public Entry - Judicial Document)]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment of Forfeiture]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Sentence]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Call]
    Date Published:January 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?497657
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =