open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-06113
    Party Name:LEPLEY v. ETHICON, INC. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred Out]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Transfer]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transfer]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Conditional Remand Order]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Conditional Transfer Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?497185
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =