open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:2:14-cv-06337
    Party Name:DECOURCEY et al v. ABB INC. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:June 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certified Copy of Order]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Notice of Docketing ROA]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Appeal Fees]
    Date Published:October 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement Form 7.1]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Approval]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Crossclaim]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Asbestos Lack of Product I.D.]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application/Petition]
    Date Published:July 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Praecipe/Request]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.paed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?497616
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =